+ − Summary
+ − Actions (30)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Public Law 86
- Signed by the Governor
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 386: yeas 89, nays 0
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 50, nays 0
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Raatz added as cosponsor
- Senator Tallian added as cosponsor
- Senator Sandlin added as third sponsor
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Young M
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 93, nays 3
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Coauthored by Representatives Steuerwald, Pressel, Negele
- Authored by Representative McNamara