+ − Summary
+ − Actions (24)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public Law 129
- Signed by the Governor
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 385: yeas 88, nays 0
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 277: yeas 47, nays 1
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot added as third sponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Tomes added as second sponsor
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Sullivan removed as coauthor
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Becker
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 13: yeas 95, nays 0
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
- Coauthored by Representatives Hostettler, Sullivan, Negele
- Authored by Representative McNamara