+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 35
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Becker, Donato, Yoder, Breaux added as cosponsors
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Returned to the House without amendments
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 200: yeas 47, nays 0
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 89, nays 2
- Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Representative Olthoff added as coauthor
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Karickhoff
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 77
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 200
- Yeas: 47