+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Public Law 37
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed;
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to committee on
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Senator Rogers added second sponsor
- Senator Kruse added first sponsor
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading: passed;
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Representative Smith V
- Coauthored by Representatives Behning and Clere