+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Public Law 183
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments;
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed;
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Boots) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 37, nays 8
- Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Walker added as second sponsor
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to committee on
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Hamm added as coauthor
- Senator Boots added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed;
- Amendment #2 (Moseley) failed;
- Amendment #1 (Moseley) prevailed;
- Amendment #5 (Riecken) failed;
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Representative Leonard
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor