+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 79
- Signed by the Governor
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot added as second sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 352: yeas 42, nays 5
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Crider
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 287: yeas 94, nays 1
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Pressel added as coauthor
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
- Coauthored by Representative VanNatter
- Authored by Representative Negele