+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Public Law 74
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Schneider added as cosponsor
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Kruse, Ford, Becker, Miller, Pat added as cosponsors
- Senator Holdman added as third sponsor
- Senator Rogers added as second sponsor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family & Children Services
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Burton added as coauthor
- Representatives Heaton, McNamara, Zent, Olthoff added as coauthors
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Senate sponsor: Senator Buck
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 97, nays 0
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Ziemke added as coauthor
- Representative Nisly added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Representatives Bosma and Macer added as coauthors
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Klinker added as coauthor
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
- Authored by Representative Frizzell
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor