+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Public Law 34
- Signed by the Governor
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. added as third sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 42, nays 3
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon and Rogers
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Jackson added as coauthor
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Representative McNamara added as coauthor
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Authored by Representative DeVon
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 76
- Yeas: 93
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 196
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 3