+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Arnold added as cosponsor
- Senator Walker added as second sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 271: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance & Financial Institutions
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senator Holdman added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 69, nays 21
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #3 (Shackleford) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Heaton added as coauthor
- Representative Hamm added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
- Authored by Representative Burton