+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 146
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 539: yeas 81, nays 0
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 398: yeas 49 and nays 0
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 2 (Smith), prevailed; voice vote
- Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed back on second reading
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 1 (Smith), prevailed; voice vote
- Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed back on second reading
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Eckerty added as second sponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Stoops added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Smith
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 99, nays 0
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Representatives Moed and DeVon added as coauthors
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Hale added as coauthor
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
- Authored by Representative Heaton