+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 397: yeas 21 and nays 28
- Reread third time: defeated Roll Call 397: yeas 21, nays 28
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reread second time: ordered engrossed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 305: yeas 23 and nays 23
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment 4 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Mrvan
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 72, nays 27
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Coauthored by Representatives Richardson and Saunders
- Authored by Representative Friend
+ − Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 1175-4
Passed
Senate Amendment 1175-1
Filed
Senate Amendment 1175-2
Filed
Senate Amendment 1175-3
Filed