+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 232: yeas 22, nays 26
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #4 (Delph) motion withdrawn
- Amendment #5 (Ford) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Commerce and Technology
- First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Ford, Sandlin and Niezgodski
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 80, nays 15
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Miller and Forestal added as coauthors
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
- Authored by Representative Morris