+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Public Law 20
- Signed by the Governor
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Arnold added as second sponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to committee on
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Senator Niemeyer added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Coauthored by Representative Soliday
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Representative Fine
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor