+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 182
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate;
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House;
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Yoder, Rogers and Merritt
- Senate Conferees appointed: Banks A and Arnold J
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
- House Advisors appointed: Lehman, Frye R, Klinker and Moseley
- House Conferees appointed: Judy and Macer
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Hershman added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Lanane added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Senator Merritt added as third sponsor
- Senator Ford added as cosponsor
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to committee on
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Schaibley added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading: passed;
- Senator Banks A added first sponsor
- Senator Arnold added second sponsor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Representative Bosma added as coauthor
- Representatives Brown, C., Pryor, Richardson, Behning, Saunders, Cook added as coauthorss
- Representative Clere added as coauthor
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Judy) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Representatives Macer and Klinker added as coauthorss
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Zent added as coauthor
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Judy
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor