+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public Law 154
- Signed by the Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 356: yeas 93, nays 1
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 264: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Senator Arnold added as second sponsor
- Senator Arnold removed as cosponsor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Steele) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Arnold added as cosponsor
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security & Transportation
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Mishler
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Speedy added as coauthor
- Representatives Truitt and Riecken added as coauthors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Authored by Representative Braun