+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Senator Tomes added as second sponsor.
- Referred to the Senate
- Senator Becker added as sponsor.
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 182: yeas 95 and nays 0
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass amend, adopted
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Sullivan added as coauthor.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to Ways and Means pursuant to rule 127
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Representative McNamara added as coauthor.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
- Coauthored by Representative Riecken
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Washburne.