+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 47, nays 0
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 86, nays 0
- Senate sponsors: Senators Young M, Koch, Crider
- Representatives Young J, Pierce added as coauthors
- Cosponsor: Senator Randolph
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Steuerwald
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 199
- Yeas: 47
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 47
- Yeas: 86