+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 202
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 617: yeas 94, nays 0
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 585: yeas 44, nays 4
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Young M and Ford J.D.
- Senate conferees appointed: Bohacek and Taylor G
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Sullivan, Young J, Beck and Hatcher
- House conferees appointed: Negele and Shackleford
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 350: yeas 42, nays 5
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Amendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Bohacek and Taylor G
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 87, nays 1
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Young J added as coauthor
- Representatives Negele and Hatcher added as coauthors
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Authored by Representative Shackleford