+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Public Law 117
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 352: yeas 93, nays 1
- Motion to concur filed
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Donato and Yoder
- Senate conferees appointed: Becker and Breaux
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Rowray, Ledbetter, Karickhoff, Fleming and Shackleford
- House conferees appointed: Vermilion and Summers
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Charbonneau and Bohacek added as cosponsors
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 49, nays 0
- Senators Young M, Tomes, Busch, Bassler added as cosponsors
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 105.2 suspended
- Representative Campbell added as coauthor
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
- Senator Alting added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Leising and Yoder added as cosponsors
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Representatives Negele, Fleming, Shackleford, Pack R, Hamilton, Boy, Klinker, Jackson, Pfaff, Schaibley, Engleman, Ziemke, Pryor, Hatcher, King J, Rowray E, Davis M, Austin, Bauer M, Mayfield, Errington added as coauthors
- Rule 105.2 suspended
- Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Donato, Breaux
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 86, nays 1
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Representatives Olthoff, Ledbetter C, Summers added as coauthors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Authored by Representative Vermilion
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 233
- Yeas: 49
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 46
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor