+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Public Law 187
- Signed by the Governor
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 509: yeas 47, nays 3
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 520: yeas 97, nays 1
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Young M and Mrvan
- Senate advisors appointed: Bray, Melton and Glick
- Senator Young M removed as conferee
- Senator Bray added as conferee
- Senator Bray removed as advisor
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Hamm, Borders, Carbaugh and DeLaney
- House conferees appointed: Frizzell and Austin
- Concurrence withdrawn; House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 411: yeas 44, nays 3
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Senator Buck added as cosponsor
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #4 (Zakas) prevailed; voice vote
- Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed back on second reading
- Amendment #3 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Bray added as second sponsor
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Young M
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 172: yeas 92, nays 1
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Representatives Austin and Carbaugh added as coauthors
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
- Authored by Representative Frizzell