+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Crane added as cosponsor
- Senator Donato added as second sponsor
- Senator Buchanan added as third sponsor
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot added as cosponsor
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Rogers
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 114: yeas 60, nays 37
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment #19 (Cook) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #7 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 94: yeas 28, nays 63
- Amendment #6 (DeLaney) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #17 (Jacob) ruled out of order voice vote
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Coauthored by Representatives Prescott and Goodrich
- Authored by Representative Cook
+ − Adopted Amendments (55)
+ − Proposed Amendments (19)
+ − Vote
January 26, 2022: Roll Call 114
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 37