+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 153
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 417: yeas 40, nays 10
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 453: yeas 63, nays 32
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Head and Taylor
- Senate Advisors appointed: Holdman, Randolph Lonnie M and Steele
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees appointed: Lehman and Austin
- House Advisors appointed: Heaton, Washburne, DeLaney and Moed
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 38, nays 12
- Senator Taylor added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 60, nays 34
- Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Holdman
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Heaton added as coauthor
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Austin added as coauthor
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Lehman
- First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions