+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 93, nays 0
- Senate sponsors: Senators Donato, Melton, Becker
- Cosponsor: Senator Breaux
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Representatives Barrett and Manning added as coauthors
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Jackson added as coauthor
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Porter
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 71
- Yeas: 93