+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Public Law 72
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 417: yeas 87 and nays 0
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 297: yeas 47 and nays 1
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
- HB 1121 Amendment #1 (Steele), prevailed.
- Senator Steele added second sponsor.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Judiciary
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 96 and nays 0
- Referred to the Senate
- Senator Hershman added as sponsor.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Koch), prevailed.
- Amendment #2 (Dvorak), failed; Roll Call 20: yeas 31 and nays 62
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Koch.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor