+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 67
- Signed by the Governor
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 328: yeas 91, nays 0
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Becker, Charbonneau, Leising added as cosponsors
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 49, nays 0
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Bauer added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Brown, T. added as coauthor
- Senate sponsor: Senator Crider
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 95, nays 0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Bacon and Brown, C. added as coauthors
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Authored by Representative Kirchhofer
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor