+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Public Law 70
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 420: yeas 33 and nays 12
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 477: yeas 93 and nays 5
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Messmer added as advisor
- Representative Dermody added as conferee
- Representative GiaQuinta added as conferee
- Representative Koch added as advisor
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Arnold added as advisor
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Austin added as advisor
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Yoder added as conferee
- Senator Randolph added as conferee
- Senator Alting added as advisor
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Banks removed second sponsor.
- Senator Hershman added second sponsor.
- Senator Banks added third sponsor.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 296: yeas 36 and nays 12
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor.
- Senator Skinner added as cosponsor.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
- HB 1116 Amendment #4 (Banks), prevailed.
- HB 1116 Amendment #3 (Glick), prevailed.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Public Policy
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Senator Yoder added as sponsor.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 79: yeas 91 and nays 4
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Eberhart added as coauthor.
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Public Policy
- Coauthored by Representative GiaQuinta
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Dermody.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor