+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 201
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 584: yeas 48, nays 0
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 603: yeas 91, nays 0
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as advisor
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Miller D and Pierce
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Young M, Randolph Lonnie M and Doriot
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: McNamara, Bartels, Beck and Hatcher
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Head and Tallian
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 399: yeas 39, nays 10
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot removed as second sponsor
- Senator Rogers removed as third sponsor
- Senator Houchin added as second sponsor
- Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
- Senator Doriot added as third sponsor
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 172: yeas 92, nays 2
- Representative Wesco added as coauthor
- Senate sponsors: Senators Head, Doriot and Rogers
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (Miller D) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Bartels added as coauthor
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Representative McNamara added as coauthor
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Authored by Representative Miller D