+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Public Law 18
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 44, nays 0
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Senator Boots added as third sponsor
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Koch and Holdman
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Representative Moseley added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
- Authored by Representative Leonard