+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Public Law 158
On March 21, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 330: yeas 73, nays 0
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 286: yeas 48, nays 2
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as cosponsor
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Doriot added as cosponsor
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Ruckelshaus and Boots
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 90, nays 3
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Amendment #2 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 120: yeas 33, nays 63
- Amendment #1 (Beck) failed; Roll Call 119: yeas 33, nays 63
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Representative Miller added as coauthor
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
- Authored by Representative Leonard