+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Miller Pete, Randolph Lonnie M and Eckerty
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hershman and Broden
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Brown T, Schaibley, Soliday, Moed and Pryor
- House Conferees appointed: Huston and Porter
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 260: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Yoder added as second sponsor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Representatives Porter and Frye added as coauthors
- Representative Moed added as coauthor
- Representative Bosma added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Senate sponsor: Senator Hershman
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 122: yeas 98, nays 0
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Smith, M. added as coauthor
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Representatives Brown, T. and Schaibley added as coauthors
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Authored by Representative Huston
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor