+ − Summary
+ − Actions (23)
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public Law 125
- Signed by the Governor
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 417: yeas 81, nays 10
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 351: yeas 50, nays 0
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Representatives Torr, McNamara, VanNatter added as coauthors
- Senate sponsors: Senators Baldwin, Garten, Messmer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 78, nays 19
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Authored by Representative Bartels