+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 162
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 557: yeas 97, nays 0
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 284: yeas 43 and nays 6
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Hume added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Mishler added as second sponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Representatives Karickhoff, Klinker, Porter and Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors
- House Rule 105.1 suspended
- Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 97, nays 0
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment 1 (Truitt), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reassigned to Committee on Ways and Means
- Representatives Dermody, Clere and Truitt added as coauthors
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Authored by Representative McNamara
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment 1110-1
Passed
House Amendment 1110-C
Filed
+ − Votes (5)
April 22, 2013: Roll Call No. 557
March 19, 2013: Roll Call No. 284
March 14, 2013: Roll Call No. 7865
February 12, 2013: Roll Call No. 111
February 7, 2013: Roll Call No. 7782
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor