+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Public Law 70
- Signed by the Governor
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 309: yeas 86, nays 7
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 46, nays 1
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Buck added as second sponsor
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Pol and Griffin added as cosponsors
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 86, nays 6
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
- Authored by Representative Soliday
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 215
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 68
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 6