+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 286: yeas 0, nays 50
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Yoder removed as cosponsor
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 57, nays 33
- Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse, Walker K, Baldwin
- Cosponsor: Senator Yoder
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Clere
- Coauthored by Representatives Behning, Goodrich, Pfaff
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
+ − Adopted Amendments (16)
+ − Proposed Amendments (14)
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 286
- Nays: 50
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 98
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 33