+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Becker
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 90, nays 0
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Klinker added as coauthor
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Reassigned to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Coauthored by Representatives Karickhoff and Pack
- Authored by Representative Ledbetter
+ − Vote
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 119
- Yeas: 90