+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Public Law 172
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate;
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House;
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Bray and Lanane
- Senate Conferees appointed: Steele and Taylor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: VanNatter, Cox, Bauer and DeLaney
- House Conferees appointed: Koch and Hale
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed;
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Head added as second sponsor
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to committee on
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Senator Steele added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Cox added as coauthor
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Representative VanNatter added as coauthor
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Hale added as coauthor
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Representative Koch