+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Cosponsor: Senator Ford Jon
- Senate sponsors: Senators Garten, Doriot, Messmer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 61, nays 29
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (DeLaney) prevailed; Roll Call 111: yeas 92, nays 0
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 84
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Representatives Miller, Pressel, Jeter C added as coauthors
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Authored by Representative Bartels
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
+ − Proposed Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 139
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 29