+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Public Law 104
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 319: yeas 81, nays 0
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Grooms added as cosponsor
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Lanane added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Busch and Glick
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 97, nays 1
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Representative Boy added as coauthor
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Representatives Eberhart and Abbott D added as coauthors
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Authored by Representative Manning