+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Glick and Perfect
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 27: yeas 94, nays 1
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Wright, Beumer, Klinker added as coauthors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
- Authored by Representative Cherry