+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer, Taylor G, Walker K
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 92, nays 2
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Porter added as coauthor
- Amendment #2 (Moed) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Representative McNamara added as coauthor
- Representative Torr added as coauthor
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Authored by Representative Moed