+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 140
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Behning removed as advisor
- Representative Smith V removed as conferee
- Representative Behning added as conferee
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Raatz removed as advisor
- Senator Qaddoura removed as conferee
- Senator Raatz added as conferee
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 380: yeas 72, nays 24
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 365: yeas 35, nays 15
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Teshka and Smith V
- House advisors appointed: Goodrich, Behning, Austin and DeLaney
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Rogers and Qaddoura
- Senate advisors appointed: Raatz and Melton
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 232: yeas 49, nays 0
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 88, nays 0
- Senate sponsors: Senators Rogers and Raatz
- Representative Ellington added as coauthor
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Representative Goodrich added as coauthor
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Teshka
- Coauthored by Representative Behning
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Proposed Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
January 13, 2022: Roll Call 15
- Yeas: 88
January 13, 2022: Roll Call 232
- Yeas: 49