+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Public Law 139
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 359: yeas 45, nays 5
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 364: yeas 94, nays 2
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Buchanan removed as advisor
- Senator Yoder removed as conferee
- Senator Buchanan added as conferee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
- House conferees appointed: Behning and Klinker
- House advisors appointed: Davis and Pfaff
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Yoder
- Senate advisors appointed: Buchanan and Ford J.D.
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 91, nays 0
- Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Buchanan
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
- Representatives Davis M and Pfaff added as coauthors
- Representative Klinker added as coauthor
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Behning
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
+ − Adopted Amendments (8)
+ − Proposed Amendments (14)
+ − Votes (2)
January 18, 2022: Roll Call 19
- Yeas: 91
January 18, 2022: Roll Call 283
- Yeas: 50