+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Public Law 197
- Signed by the Governor
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Dissent withdrawn
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 409: yeas 99, nays 0
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Pierce added as advisor
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Miller Pete and Mrvan
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hershman and Broden
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Ober, Huston, Porter and Stemler
- House Conferees appointed: Thompson and Pryor
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 41, nays 4
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Miller, Pete added as second sponsor
- Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Hershman
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Authored by Representative Thompson
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor