+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 92
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 322: yeas 90, nays 1
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 50, nays 0
- Senator Alting added as third sponsor
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Becker added as cosponsor
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Senators Walker K, Glick, Sandlin, Freeman added as cosponsors
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 85, nays 4
- Senate sponsors: Senators Bohacek and Brown L
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Representative Shackleford added as coauthor
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Negele
- Coauthored by Representatives Errington and Schaibley
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 282
- Yeas: 50
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 45
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor