+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Byrne added as cosponsor
- Senator Crane added as cosponsor
- Senators Garten and Young M added as cosponsors
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 8: yeas 64, nays 29
- Senate sponsors: Senators Koch, Tomes, Houchin
- Rule 105.2 suspended
- Representative Snow C added as coauthor
- Cosponsor: Senator Messmer
- Representatives Carbaugh, Lindauer, Engleman, Gutwein, Wesco, Teshka J, May, Behning, Heaton, Frye, Mayfield, Hostettler, Jeter C, Judy, Abbott D, Lauer, Barrett, Leonard, Cook, Davis M, Ledbetter C, VanNatter, Heine, Manning, Davisson J., Payne Z added as coauthors
- Representative Borders added as coauthor
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #3 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Gore) ruled out of order
- Amendment #1 (Andrade) ruled out of order
- Representative Lucas added as coauthor
- Appeal the ruling of the chair (Gore); ruling of the chair sustained. Roll Call 5: yeas 66, nays 24
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Smaltz
- Coauthored by Representative Lehman
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
+ − Adopted Amendments (12)
+ − Proposed Amendments (10)
+ − Vote
January 11, 2022: Roll Call 8
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 29
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor