+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 178
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 398: yeas 99, nays 0
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 407: yeas 47, nays 1
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as conferee
- Senator Stoops removed as conferee
- Senator Melton removed as advisor
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Melton, Zay and Buchanan
- Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Stoops
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: May, Schaibley, Smith V and Moseley
- House conferees appointed: Sullivan and Austin
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 247: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as second sponsor
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 92, nays 0
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Sullivan) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Coauthored by Representatives Austin, May and Schaibley
- Authored by Representative Sullivan