+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Garten removed as second sponsor
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 52, nays 39
- Senate sponsors: Senators Buchanan and Garten
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 106: yeas 24, nays 66
- Amendment #5 (Harris) failed; Roll Call 107: yeas 26, nays 65
- Amendment #3 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 108: yeas 27, nays 63
- Amendment #4 (Porter) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #11 (Smith V) motion withdrawn
- Amendment #7 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 109: yeas 26, nays 62
- Amendment #8 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 110: yeas 28, nays 67
- Amendment #9 (Porter) motion withdrawn
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Representative O'Brien T added as coauthor
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Teshka J added as coauthor
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Behning
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
+ − Adopted Amendments (14)
+ − Proposed Amendments (8)
+ − Vote
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 138
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 39