+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Public Law 64
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 252: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Holdman and Miller, Pat added as cosponsors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Senator Steele added as second sponsor
- Senators Zakas, Head, Crider, Young, M., Bray, Delph, Glick, Broden, Taylor added as cosponsors
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Representatives Soliday and Riecken added as coauthors
- Amendment #3 (Slager) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Hale added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Authored by Representative Slager