+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 44
- Signed by the Governor
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 405: yeas 89, nays 0
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Alting added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 48, nays 0
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
- Senator Crane added as cosponsor
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Crider, Raatz and Koch
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 99, nays 0
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Judy and Macer added as coauthors
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
- Coauthored by Representative Barrett
- Authored by Representative Frye R