+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 68
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 495: yeas 99 and nays 0
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 450: yeas 48 and nays 0
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Mishler added as advisor
- Senator Stoops added as advisor
- Senator Breaux added as conferee
- Senator Leising added as conferee
- Senator Pat Miller added as advisor
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Klinker added as advisor
- Representative Slager added as advisor
- Representative Shackleford added as conferee
- Representative Frizzell added as conferee
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Alting added third sponsor.
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 287: yeas 48 and nays 0
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
- HB 1061 Amendment #1 (Miller, Pat), prevailed.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Senator Breaux added as second sponsor.
- Senator Leising added as sponsor.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 90 and nays 5
- Referred to the Senate
- Representative Klinker added as coauthor.
- Representative Shackleford added as coauthor.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Slager added as coauthor.
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Public Health
- Authored by Representative Frizzell
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor